LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1651
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1651
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1651
Compare Versions
AB1651 Chaptered September 29, 2016
AB1651 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1651 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1651 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1651 Amended June 20, 2016
AB1651 Amended March 17, 2016
AB1651 Introduced January 12, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1651 Chaptered September 29, 2016
AB1651 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1651 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1651 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1651 Amended June 20, 2016
AB1651 Amended March 17, 2016
AB1651 Introduced January 12, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare