|
09/29/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 6288.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 5223.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 5206.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|