LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1653
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1653
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1653
Compare Versions
AB1653 Enrolled August 29, 2016
AB1653 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1653 Amended June 28, 2016
AB1653 Amended May 31, 2016
AB1653 Introduced January 13, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1653 Enrolled August 29, 2016
AB1653 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1653 Amended June 28, 2016
AB1653 Amended May 31, 2016
AB1653 Introduced January 13, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare