|
09/29/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6576.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 6577.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 5567.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended. (Page 5483.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 2. Page 4864.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|