California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1662 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Amended

Bill August 29, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016
Bill March 3, 2016