|
09/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 604, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6436.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5343.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q., T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 4774.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|