California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1685 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016