|
09/24/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 555, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 6028.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4960.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 4. Page 4776.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/20/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|