California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1687 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill May 5, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016