California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB169 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill June 18, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015