LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB169
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB169
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB169
Compare Versions
AB169 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB169 Enrolled September 2, 2015
AB169 Amended June 18, 2015
AB169 Amended April 6, 2015
AB169 Amended March 26, 2015
AB169 Introduced January 22, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB169 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB169 Enrolled September 2, 2015
AB169 Amended June 18, 2015
AB169 Amended April 6, 2015
AB169 Amended March 26, 2015
AB169 Introduced January 22, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare