|
09/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 877, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 5249.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5128.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|