California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1690 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 26, 2016
Bill August 24, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill March 14, 2016