Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 4897.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|