California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1691 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 3, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill May 12, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016