California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1701 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 30, 2016

Amended

Bill June 27, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016