LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1701
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1701
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1701
Compare Versions
AB1701 Chaptered August 30, 2016
AB1701 Enrolled August 22, 2016
AB1701 Amended June 27, 2016
AB1701 Amended June 23, 2016
AB1701 Introduced January 25, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1701 Chaptered August 30, 2016
AB1701 Enrolled August 22, 2016
AB1701 Amended June 27, 2016
AB1701 Amended June 23, 2016
AB1701 Introduced January 25, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare