California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1702 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2016

Amended

Bill June 16, 2016
Bill March 16, 2016
Bill March 7, 2016