LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1702
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1702
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1702
Compare Versions
AB1702 Chaptered August 17, 2016
AB1702 Enrolled August 2, 2016
AB1702 Amended June 16, 2016
AB1702 Amended March 16, 2016
AB1702 Amended March 7, 2016
AB1702 Introduced January 25, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1702 Chaptered August 17, 2016
AB1702 Enrolled August 2, 2016
AB1702 Amended June 16, 2016
AB1702 Amended March 16, 2016
AB1702 Amended March 7, 2016
AB1702 Introduced January 25, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare