California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1719 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill April 21, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 16, 2016