LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1719
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1719
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1719
Compare Versions
AB1719 Chaptered September 24, 2016
AB1719 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1719 Amended August 16, 2016
AB1719 Amended June 22, 2016
AB1719 Amended April 21, 2016
AB1719 Amended April 11, 2016
AB1719 Amended March 16, 2016
AB1719 Introduced January 27, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1719 Chaptered September 24, 2016
AB1719 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1719 Amended August 16, 2016
AB1719 Amended June 22, 2016
AB1719 Amended April 21, 2016
AB1719 Amended April 11, 2016
AB1719 Amended March 16, 2016
AB1719 Introduced January 27, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare