|
09/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 607, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6360.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5277.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 5215.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|