California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1726 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill March 1, 2016