|
09/26/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6569.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6571.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5567.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 5375.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5088.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|