California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1730 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Amended

Bill August 25, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016