|
07/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 67, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
07/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4645.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4627.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|