California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1735 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2016

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 22, 2016

Amended

Bill April 21, 2016
Bill March 15, 2016