California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1736 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2016

Amended

Bill May 12, 2016
Bill May 3, 2016
Bill April 21, 2016
Bill March 10, 2016