LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1736
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1736
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1736
Compare Versions
AB1736 Amended May 12, 2016
AB1736 Amended May 3, 2016
AB1736 Amended April 21, 2016
AB1736 Amended March 10, 2016
AB1736 Introduced February 1, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1736 Amended May 12, 2016
AB1736 Amended May 3, 2016
AB1736 Amended April 21, 2016
AB1736 Amended March 10, 2016
AB1736 Introduced February 1, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare