|
09/21/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6159.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5134.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4684.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|