California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1739 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 2, 2016
Bill April 19, 2016
Bill March 16, 2016