Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Berryhill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 4954.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/03/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|