California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1749 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2016

Amended

Bill August 8, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill April 27, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016