California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB177 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015
Bill March 3, 2015