LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB177
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB177
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB177
Compare Versions
AB177 Chaptered October 2, 2015
AB177 Enrolled September 15, 2015
AB177 Amended September 4, 2015
AB177 Amended August 31, 2015
AB177 Amended June 30, 2015
AB177 Amended April 23, 2015
AB177 Amended March 3, 2015
AB177 Introduced January 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB177 Chaptered October 2, 2015
AB177 Enrolled September 15, 2015
AB177 Amended September 4, 2015
AB177 Amended August 31, 2015
AB177 Amended June 30, 2015
AB177 Amended April 23, 2015
AB177 Amended March 3, 2015
AB177 Introduced January 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare