|
08/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 244, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5809.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4878.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4784.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|