California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1793 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill May 4, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016