|
09/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 608, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6474.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6482.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5487.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Held at Desk. Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended. (Page 5315.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5043.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 5220.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 4.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|