California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1795 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 24, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016