California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1815 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2016

Amended

Bill May 2, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016
Bill March 7, 2016