LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1815
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1815
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1815
Compare Versions
AB1815 Amended May 2, 2016
AB1815 Amended April 11, 2016
AB1815 Amended March 28, 2016
AB1815 Amended March 7, 2016
AB1815 Introduced February 8, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1815 Amended May 2, 2016
AB1815 Amended April 11, 2016
AB1815 Amended March 28, 2016
AB1815 Amended March 7, 2016
AB1815 Introduced February 8, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare