|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2941.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2483.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hueso.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 1378.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|