California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB182 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Amended

Bill June 22, 2015
Bill April 29, 2015
Bill April 9, 2015