|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 819, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6474.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6483.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5484.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5081.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|