California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1836 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016