|
09/21/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 404, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 6185.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 4962.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 4861.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|