California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1840 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016