|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 686, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 41. Noes 36. Page 6309.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 5243.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 13. Page 5133.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5133.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 4497.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|