California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1843 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 11, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill May 12, 2016