California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1849 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016